+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 73
- Approved by the Governor
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 1873-1874
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 668-669
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Remarks see House Journal Page 603-604
- Second consideration, with amendments
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
+ − Votes (3)
June 16, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1989 PN 3629, FINAL PASSAGE
June 4, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 1989 PN 3629, FP
June 2, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 1989 PN 2948, 2013 A6540, HAHN
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor