+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
On October 15, 2018 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (189-1)
On October 10, 2018 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 9, 2018 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 2, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
October 15, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 1981 PN 4198, FP
October 9, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 1981 PN 3323, 2017 A9567, R. BROWN
October 9, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 1981 PN 3323, 2017 A6949, BIZZARRO
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor