+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (193-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On December 18, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On December 17, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On November 18, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
January 13, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1973 PN 2736, FP
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor