+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 204
- Third consideration and final passage (191-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On December 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION