+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT