+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On September 27, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On September 26, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On June 21, 2016 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (132-65)
- Re-reported as committed
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- In the Senate
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 534-539
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Votes (3)
June 21, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1948 PN 3056, MOT CONST, FRANKEL
June 21, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1948 PN 3056, FP
April 6, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1948 PN 3056, MOT POSTPONE, DEAN
+ − Sponsors (94)
Type:
Primary Sponsor