+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 703-704
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
- In the House
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3667
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (180-15)
- Remarks see House Journal Page 590-603
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 562-566
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY