+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (202-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 28, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE