+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On December 12, 2017 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2076-2077
- Third consideration and final passage (116-76)
- Re-reported as committed
On December 11, 2017 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2035-2046
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On December 6, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On December 5, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On December 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
December 12, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 1940 PN 2779, FP
December 11, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 1940 PN 2779, 2017 A5083, HANNA
December 11, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 1940 PN 2779, 2017 A5102, KINSEY
December 11, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 1940 PN 2779, 2017 A5105, KRUEGER-BRANEKY
December 11, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 1940 PN 2779, 2017 A5147, DEAN
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor