+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On July 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Act No. 36 of 2022
- Approved by the Governor
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
On June 13, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 579-580
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 27, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 26, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (2)
June 30, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1935 PN 2210, Final Passage
June 13, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 1935 PN 2210, FP
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor