+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 27, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Vote
March 18, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 1925 PN 3114, FP
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor