+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On November 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On November 18, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1826-1832
- Third consideration and final passage (123-76)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1774-1777
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
November 18, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1890 PN 2623, FP
October 30, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1890 PN 2623, 2019 A3595, DELISSIO
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor