+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 27, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On October 26, 2016 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (34-14)
- Referred to RULES
On October 25, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments (37-11)
On October 19, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 18, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (136-55)
- Remarks see House Journal Page
On September 28, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 26, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 20, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Votes (4)
October 17, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1885 PN 3075, 2015 A10615, SUSP RULES, STURLA
October 17, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1885 PN 3075, MOT POSTPONE, CRUZ
October 17, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1885 PN 3075, FP
+ − Sponsors (45)
white
Type:
Primary Sponsor