+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 24, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 113
- Approved by the Governor
On October 17, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- House concurred in Senate amendments (187-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On October 16, 2018 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On October 15, 2018 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
- Removed from table
On October 1, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 303
- Third consideration and final passage (190-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
October 17, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 1885 PN 4255, CONCUR
October 16, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1885 PN 4255, FINAL PASSAGE
April 10, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 1885 PN 3167, FP
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor