+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1066
- House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (189-0)
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 365-366
- Third consideration and final passage (194-1)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
+ − Votes (3)
June 17, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 188 PN 1828, CONCUR
June 10, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 188 PN 1757, FINAL PASSAGE
March 4, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 188 PN 180, FP
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor