+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 61
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Second consideration
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On December 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Votes (2)
June 9, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1873 PN 2741, FINAL PASSAGE
January 28, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 1873 PN 2741, FP
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor