+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On October 27, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1395
- Third consideration and final passage (199-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 26, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 25, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On October 4, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On September 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
October 27, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1871 PN 2230, FP
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor