+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 324
- Third consideration and final passage (198-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Vote
March 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 186 PN 178, FP
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor