+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On July 20, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 94
- Approved by the Governor
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (189-0)
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (2)
July 1, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1856 PN 2870, FINAL PASSAGE
May 24, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1856 PN 2870, FP
+ − Sponsors (62)
Type:
Primary Sponsor