+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
- Act No. 13
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in House
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Second consideration
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On November 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On October 24, 2017 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (184-0)
On October 18, 2017 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 17, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On October 16, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1854 PN 2585, FINAL PASSAGE
October 24, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 1854 PN 2585, FP
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor