+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HUMAN SERVICES
+ − Vote
April 13, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1843 PN 2840, FP
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor