+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 24, 2018 in the House:
- Act No. 111
- Approved by the Governor
On October 18, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Final passage (34-15)
- Vote on final passage reconsidered
- Third consideration and final passage (33-16)
On October 16, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to revert to Prior Printer's No. 3802
On October 15, 2018 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 3, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 2, 2018 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 1, 2018 in the House:
- Amended in Senate Committee on LABOR AND INDUSTRY
On June 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (115-80)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 21, 2018 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 11, 2018 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 4, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
October 17, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1840 PN 3802, FINAL PASSAGE
October 17, 2018: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1840 PN 3802, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED
June 22, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 1840 PN 3802, FP
June 21, 2018: House Floor Vote: HB 1840 PN 3595, 2017 A7879, KAUFFMAN
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor