+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 30, 2021 in the House:
- Act No. 71 of 2021
- Approved by the Governor
On September 22, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On September 21, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1216-1219
- House concurred in Senate amendments (152-49)
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (34-16)
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as amended
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 457
- Third consideration and final passage (162-39)
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 291 - 294
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (5)
September 21, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 184 PN 1884, CONCUR
June 25, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: HB 184 PN 1884, Final Passage
April 7, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 184 PN 964, FP
March 17, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 184 PN 152, 2021 A372, KEEFER
March 17, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 184 PN 152, 2021 A356, HOHENSTEIN
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor