+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 186-188
- Third consideration and final passage (127-53)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
+ − Vote
February 10, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1802 PN 2762, FP
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor