+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (152-37)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Vote
May 24, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1799 PN 2759, FP
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor