+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On September 27, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
June 14, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1779 PN 2706, FP
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor