+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 14, 2020 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On July 13, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 27, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On August 30, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
+ − Analysis
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor