+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On July 9, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 114
- Approved by the Governor
On July 1, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 28, 2014 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 27, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT