+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (196-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 20, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 177 PN 341, FP
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor