+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 809
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 781
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 1769 PN 3747, FP
June 16, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 1769 PN 2499, 2013 A7526, HANNA
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor