+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (172-17)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On December 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1740 PN 3429, FP
May 25, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1740 PN 2619, 2015 A7657, DIAMOND
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor