+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 2, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 123
- Approved by the Governor
On October 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 26, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (191-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On October 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 692
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On December 18, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On December 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
+ − Votes (4)
October 26, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1737 PN 4028, CONCUR
October 26, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1737 PN 4028, FINAL PASSAGE
May 16, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1737 PN 3285, FP
May 3, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1737 PN 2607, 2015 A7014, MAHER
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor