+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On November 2, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 118
- Approved by the Governor
On October 25, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On October 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On December 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (190-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On December 15, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On December 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Votes (2)
October 19, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1734 PN 2598, FINAL PASSAGE
December 17, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1734 PN 2598, FP
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor