+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (177-1)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 141
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On November 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
+ − Votes (2)
February 10, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1722 PN 2844, FP
February 9, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1722 PN 2587, 2015 A5716, JOZWIAK
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor