+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On December 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On December 15, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-1)
- Re-reported as committed
On December 14, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On December 13, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On November 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Vote
December 15, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1716 PN 2583, FP
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor