+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
On December 18, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On July 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 3, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1711 PN 2584, FP
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor