+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 1, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 48
- Approved by the Governor
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1008-1009
- House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-1)
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
On December 18, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On July 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 24, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1710 PN 3855, CONCUR
June 24, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1710 PN 3855, FINAL PASSAGE
February 3, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1710 PN 2583, FP
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor