+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On October 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On October 22, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1618
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Vote
October 22, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1705 PN 2297, FP
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor