+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 3, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 136
- Approved by the Governor
On October 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 26, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On October 19, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On October 18, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (183-8)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
+ − Votes (2)
October 26, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1703 PN 2849, FINAL PASSAGE
March 21, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1703 PN 2849, FP
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor