+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 765-767
- Third consideration and final passage (188-2)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 742
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 17 PN 3364, FP
May 17, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 17 PN 1184, 2015 A818, MARSICO
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor