+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 21, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 172
- Approved by the Governor
On November 14, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On November 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On October 27, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (182-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On October 26, 2016 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On October 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 19, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On September 27, 2016 in the House:
- Reported as amended
- First consideration
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 561
- Third consideration and final passage (194-0)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On December 6, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On November 10, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On November 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Votes (3)
October 27, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1683 PN 4128, CONCUR
October 26, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1683 PN 4128, FINAL PASSAGE
April 11, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1683 PN 2507, FP
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor