+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 21, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 171
- Approved by the Governor
On November 14, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On November 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On October 27, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in House
On October 26, 2016 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (47-0)
On October 25, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On September 26, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Removed from table
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
On December 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On December 14, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2228
- Third consideration and final passage (197-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On December 13, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2202
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Votes (4)
October 26, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1653 PN 2661, FINAL PASSAGE
December 14, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1653 PN 2661, FP
December 13, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1653 PN 2633, 2015 A5062, SUSP RULES, OBERLANDER
December 13, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1653 PN 2633, 2015 A5062, OBERLANDER
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor