+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 6, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 8, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (202-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 829-830
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 19, 2020 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 9, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1647 PN 3879, FP
May 28, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1647 PN 3793, 2019 A5895, EMRICK
May 28, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1647 PN 3793, 2019 A5803, CIRESI
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor