+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 21, 2018 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On November 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On October 16, 2017 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1630-1631
- Third consideration and final passage (161-30)
On October 3, 2017 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 2, 2017 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 26, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 25, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
October 16, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 1646 PN 2466, FP
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor