+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 28, 2022 in the House:
- Act No. 98 of 2022
- Approved by the Governor
On October 27, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 26, 2022 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (198-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On October 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Amended on third consideration
On October 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On October 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On September 12, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 202-204
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (5)
October 26, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 1630 PN 3605, CONCURRENCE
October 26, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1630 PN 3605, Final Passage
October 25, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1630 PN 1806, 2021 A5852, Motion to Table FONTANA Amendment No. A-5852
September 12, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 1630 PN 1806, FP
March 29, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 1630 PN 1806, 2021 A3677, MOT APPEAL CHAIR
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor