+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On November 23, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (196-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On November 19, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 18, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Vote
November 23, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1626 PN 2351, FP
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor