+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On November 3, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 127
- Approved by the Governor
On October 26, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (189-4)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (47-0)
On October 18, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 28, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2252-2253
- Third consideration and final passage (187-7)
- Re-reported as committed
On December 15, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2240-2242
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On December 14, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On November 4, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
+ − Votes (4)
October 25, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 162 PN 3955, CONCUR
October 24, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 162 PN 3955, FINAL PASSAGE
December 16, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 162 PN 1943, FP
December 15, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 162 PN 1943, 2015 A2765, MILLER, D.
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor