+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On October 26, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 112
- Approved by the Governor
On October 18, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On September 27, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On September 26, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (182-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Votes (2)
October 17, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1619 PN 2348, FINAL PASSAGE
June 15, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1619 PN 2348, FP
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor