+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On November 25, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 125
- Approved by the Governor
On November 20, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (191-11)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On November 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On November 17, 2020 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (42-6)
On October 20, 2020 in the House:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page ....
- Amended on third consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On October 19, 2020 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
On October 6, 2020 in the House:
- Second consideration
On October 5, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Third consideration and final passage (183-16)
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1735-1736
- In the Senate
On October 28, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Removed from table
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
November 19, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1617 PN 4572, CONCUR
November 17, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1617 PN 4572, FINAL PASSAGE
October 29, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1617 PN 2737, FP
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor