+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 11, 2022 in the House:
- Act No. 67 of 2022
- Approved by the Governor
On July 8, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On July 7, 2022 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (186-14)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On July 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 784
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
- Amended on third consideration
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
On October 26, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1382-1384
- Third consideration and final passage (137-61)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 25, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1360-1363
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 6, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 15, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL
+ − Votes (5)
July 7, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 1615 PN 3365, CONCUR
July 7, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1615 PN 3365, Final Passage
October 26, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1615 PN 2308, FP
October 25, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1615 PN 1789, 2021 A2545
October 25, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1615 PN 1789, 2021 A2692, SUSP RULES
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor